Cole v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Timmy Ale Cole, Jr.
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02729
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/19/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 18, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, April 19, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 2, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 9, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/11/2019. On the phone was Scott R. Seideman for the plaintiff. Present in court was Dell P. Chapell for the defendant. The court discussed dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, April 19, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 2, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 9, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Cole v. Bard, et al. - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B_Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C_CMO 7-Adverse Event Redactions, #4 Exhibit D_CMO 17-AMENDED_PO and Expedited ESI Production - protective order, #5 Exhibit E_CMO 12-Records Collection, #6 Exhibit F_CMO 21-Discovery Protocol, #7 Exhibit G_CMO 9 -ESI Production Protocol, #8 Exhibit H_CMO 14-Deposition Protocols)(Chappell, Dell)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214634) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214619) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, December 11, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR RICHARD B. NORTH, JR. TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 10/29/2019. (Vescovo, Diane)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-03824. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj).
October 24, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-3824-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16974963 filed by Timmy Ale Cole, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timmy Ale Cole, Jr.
Represented By: Scott R Seideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?