Morris v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Julie Morris
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02731
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for 9/18/2020 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr on 11/21/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/18/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 7/15/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020. Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2020. Motions due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/22/2019. (Fowlkes, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 11/21/2019. Both Parties present telephonically. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. The Court will adjust the dates proposed in the scheduling order & will enter an order for mediation. Case set Friday, 09/18/2020 at 10:00 for Status Conference. (Plaintiff: James A. Morris, Jr. by phone)(Defense: Woods Drinkwater by phone, Dell P. Chappell by phone) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 *****Please disregard as the order has been granted******DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3219999) filed by Julie Morris has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: See Local Rule 83.4(d)(A) a certificate of good standing from the highest Court of a state or the District of Columbia, AND from A UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT. Also proposed orders are to be emailed to the Judge's Chambers. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) Modified on 11/21/2019 (jld).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/20/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3219999) by Julie Morris. (Boyd, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Boyd on behalf of Julie Morris (Boyd, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/14/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 11/14/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214628) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappell (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214618) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Woods Drinkwater on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Drinkwater, Woods)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 10:00 AM (cst) in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/2019. (Fowlkes, J.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02402. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj).
October 24, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Julie Morris. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2402-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
July 19, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13188099 filed by Julie Morris.(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Represented By: Woods Drinkwater
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Represented By: Woods Drinkwater
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Morris
Represented By: James A Morris, Jr.
Represented By: Amy J Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?