Rice v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Leonard R Rice
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv02733
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Mediator by Leonard R Rice. (Higgins, Charles)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #26 FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 19-2733. (shl)
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Leonard R Rice. (Stoller, Paul)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 11, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, March 15, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 26, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 5, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/11/2019. On the phone were Ashley Crowell and Paul L. Stoller for the plaintiff. Present in court were Lani D. Lester for the plaintiff and Dell P. Chapell for the defendant. The court discussed dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, March 15, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 15-18 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 26, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, March 5, 2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Leonard R Rice re #18 Status Report Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G)(Stoller, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**.] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/6/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3232104) by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Crowell, Ashley)
December 5, 2019 Filing 19 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #18 Status Report filed by Leonard R Rice has been filed. For future reference, please note Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. If no proposed order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT JOINT RULE 26(f) STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Stoller, Paul)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/4/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3229034) by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Stoller, Paul)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lani D. Lester on behalf of Leonard R Rice (Lester, Lani)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of Leonard R Rice (Higgins, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/14/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric A. Paine (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214636) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Paine, Eric)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Dell P. Chappel (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3214621) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Chappell, Dell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, December 11, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 10/30/2019. (Claxton, Charmiane)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Richard B. North, Jr. (proposed order submitted) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane Gibson Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02037. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2019: #2 Exhibit judges' cards and docket sheet) (agj).
October 24, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 Member Case CV-18-2037-PHX-DGC has been consolidated into Lead Case MDL-2641 on this date. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15668234 filed by Leonard R Rice. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Shane Gibson Ramsey
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Eric Alfred Paine
Represented By: Dell P Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard R Rice
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Lani D. Lester
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: Paul L. Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?