Shelby County Democratic Party et al v. Alexandria-Williams et al
Plaintiff: Marek For Memphis and Shelby County Democratic Party
Defendant: Gregory Grant, M. Latroy Alexandria-Williams and Shelby County Democratic Club
Not Yet Classified: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2019cv02769
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
2 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 02:437
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by M. Latroy Alexandria-Williams, Shelby County Democratic Club Memorandum In Support of Removal Jurisdiction (Robinson, Paul)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Taylor Bolton on behalf of Gregory Grant (Bolton, Julian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was to be held on 12/17/2019. Bruce S. Kramer appeared for the plaintiffs. Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr. appeared for defendant M. Latroy Alexandria-Williams. Defense Counsel to file a brief re: jurisdiction by close of business on Monday, January 6, 2020. Plaintiff's reply due by close of business on Monday, January 13, 2020. The court will enter a ruling upon receipt and review of the documents and will set another hearing date if needed. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Alexandria williams. (Robinson, Paul)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr on behalf of M. Latroy Alexandria-Williams (Robinson, Paul)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Kramer, Bruce)
December 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by M. Latroy Alexandria-Williams Notice of Appearance of Attorney (Robinson, Paul)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Bruce S. Kramer, Attorney at Law. (Lipman, Sheryl)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, December 17, 2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelby County Democratic Party, Marek For Memphis from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-19-1370-3. ( Filing fee $ 400), filed by Shelby County Democratic Party, Marek For Memphis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Notice of filing notice of removal)(jae) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #4 exhibit) (jae). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2019: #5 Receipt) (jae). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2019: #6 Judicial assignment card) (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelby County Democratic Party et al v. Alexandria-Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Grant
Represented By: Julian Taylor Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Latroy Alexandria-Williams
Represented By: Paul Anthony Robinson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Democratic Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marek For Memphis
Represented By: Jacob Webster Brown
Represented By: Bruce S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby County Democratic Party
Represented By: Jacob Webster Brown
Represented By: Bruce S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?