H. Saga International Inc. v. EM1 Labs, LLC et al
Plaintiff: H. Saga International Inc.
Defendant: Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC and EM1 Labs, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2019cv02778
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION Regarding Selection of Mediator by H. Saga International Inc.. (Varela, Pablo)
January 9, 2020 Filing 26 Amended ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Koch, Brian)
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Koch, Brian)
December 26, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against EM1 Labs, LLC, Angelo Skulas, filed by H. Saga International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Varela, Pablo)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/19/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 12/19/2019. Pablo Adrian Varela appeared for the plaintiff. On the phone was Brian Koch for the defendant. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #8 was DENIED as moot. Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, January 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by January 8, 2021. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, January 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) (smm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Varela, Pablo)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT. Party Angelo Skulas terminated. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/11/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Angelo Skulas only by H. Saga International Inc.. (Varela, Pablo)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: **CHANGE IN TIME ONLY** (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 10:00 AM the has been reset to Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 11:30 AM (CST) in Courtroom 1- Memphis, before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (CHANGE IN TIME ONLY). (smm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Angelo Skulas' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by H. Saga International Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note: Proposed order should not be published to CM/ECF, but only emailed to chambers. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT ANGELO SKULAS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION #13 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/02/2019. (shl)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/2/19. (Lipman, Sheryl)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Angelo Skulas' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by H. Saga International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Varela, Pablo)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3226384) by EM1 Labs, LLC, Angelo Skulas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - USDC So. Dist. Florida, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Florida)(Koch, Brian)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant EM1 Labs, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EM1 Labs, LLC.(Molloy, Catherine)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #9 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/21/2019. (shl)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by EMI1 Labs, LLC. (Molloy, Catherine)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Angelo Skulas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Angelo Skulas, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint From Related Florida Litigation)(Molloy, Catherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, December 19, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC has been filed. For future reference, please note ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 electronic signature. A "wet signature" was used on the civil cover sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC from Thirtieth Judicial District at Memphis, case number CH-19-1288 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3214091), filed by Angelo Skulas, EMI1 Labs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal to District Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Molloy, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. Saga International Inc. v. EM1 Labs, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo Skulas
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: Brian Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI1 Labs, LLC
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EM1 Labs, LLC
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: Brian Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Saga International Inc.
Represented By: John L. Ryder
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?