Amtrust Corporate Member Limited v. LIR Income Fund I, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Amtrust Corporate Member Limited
Defendant: LIR Income Fund I, LLC, Lubin Property Management, LLC and Lesley F. Coach
Case Number: 2:2019cv02782
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING MOTION #25 TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 01/03/2020. Attorney William W. Silverman is admitted to participate in this action as counsel for plaintiff AmTrust Corporate Member Limited. (Mays, Samuel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Roxana Rudolph on behalf of Amtrust Corporate Member Limited (Rudolph, Mary)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3249818) by Amtrust Corporate Member Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Silverman, William)
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by LIR Income Fund I, LLC, Lubin Property Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hughes, Brett)
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss (proposed Order submitted) by Lesley F. Coach. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Rainey, Austin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Thursday, 01/30/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Patterson on behalf of Lesley F. Coach (Patterson, Chris)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT LESLEY F. COACHS MOTION FOR EXTENSIONOF TIME. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 12/6/2019. (Vescovo, Diane)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Deadline , proposed order submitted, by Lesley F. Coach. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Rainey, Austin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Taylor Rainey on behalf of Lesley F. Coach (Rainey, Austin)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME OF DEFENDANTS LIR INCOME FUND I, LLC AND LUBIN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo on 12/6/2019. (Vescovo, Diane)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of LIR Income Fund I, LLC, Lubin Property Management, LLC (Hughes, Brett)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Lubin Property Management, LLC, LIR Income Fund I, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The filing should be entered using the login and password and s/signature of the person who is stating they are to be added to the case. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amtrust Corporate Member Limited as to LIR Income Fund I, LLC. (Anderson, S.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amtrust Corporate Member Limited as to Lesley F. Coach. (Anderson, S.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amtrust Corporate Member Limited as to Lubin Property Management, LLC. (Anderson, S.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Proposed Order Submitted by LIR Income Fund I, LLC, Lubin Property Management, LLC. (Martin, Laura)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of LIR Income Fund I, LLC, Lubin Property Management, LLC (Hughes, Brett)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura S. Martin on behalf of LIR Income Fund I, LLC, Lubin Property Management, LLC (Martin, Laura)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lubin Property Management, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LIR Income Fund I, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lesley F. Coach. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3215127), filed by Amtrust Corporate Member Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Reservation of Rights, #3 Exhibit C - Insurance Policy, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Lesley F. Coach, #6 Summons LIR Income Fund I, LLC, #7 Summons Lubin Property Management, LLC, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Anderson, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amtrust Corporate Member Limited v. LIR Income Fund I, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amtrust Corporate Member Limited
Represented By: S. Newton Anderson
Represented By: William W. Silverman
Represented By: Mary Roxana Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIR Income Fund I, LLC
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Brett A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubin Property Management, LLC
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Brett A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley F. Coach
Represented By: Chris Patterson
Represented By: Austin Taylor Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?