Childers et al v. Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Larry Childers and Margie Childers
Defendant: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC and Federal Building Services, Inc
Not Yet Classified: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02806
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bass Pro, LLC, Corporate Parent Bass Pro Group, LLC, Corporate Parent American Sportsman Holding Company for Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC.. (Cooper Roney, Margaret)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Building Services, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Federal Cleaning Contractors, Inc. for Federal Building Services, Inc.. (Cooper Roney, Margaret)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC.(Cooper Roney, Margaret)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Federal Building Services, Inc.(Cooper Roney, Margaret)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER [NO IMAGE ATTACHED] granting #6 Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to respond to Complaint until on or before December 5, 2019 signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/2/19. (Fowlkes, J.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Response to Amended Complaint proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Deakins, Laura)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Building Services, Inc from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0962-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3221438), filed by Federal Building Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Cooper Roney, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childers et al v. Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Cooper Roney
Represented By: Laura Lampton Deakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Building Services, Inc
Represented By: Margaret Cooper Roney
Represented By: Laura Lampton Deakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Childers
Represented By: Bradford Jones Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Childers
Represented By: Bradford Jones Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?