Elliott et al v. ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Plaintiff: John E Shannon, Jr, Benjamin Miller, Donald W Boxx, Jacob R Elliott and Joshua T Leggett
Defendant: ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Not Yet Classified: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02807
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Initial Disclosures (Childress, Dennis)
January 17, 2020 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for [29-1] Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Shelby County Sheriff's Office on 1/13/2020, filed by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 17, 2020 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for [28-1] Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Memphis Light Gas & Water on 1/13/2020, filed by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 17, 2020 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for [27-1] Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Shelby County Fire Department on 1/13/2020, filed by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 16, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Millington City Fire Dept.)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 16, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Memphis Light Gas & Water)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Amended Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Subpoena to Shelby County Sheriff's Office)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 10, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Amended Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Subpoena to Memphis Light Gas & Water)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Amended Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Subpoena to Shelby County Fire Dept.)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Shelby County Sheriff's Office)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Shelby County Fire Department)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum on a Non-Party (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to Memphis Light Gas & Water)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
January 8, 2020 Filing 23 SETTING LETTER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Civil Jury Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 01/08/2020. (Parker, Thomas)
January 7, 2020 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker; Scheduling Conference held on 1/7/2020. Autumn Chastain and Stephen Leffler appeared for the Plaintiffs and Dennis Childress appeared for the Defendant. This is a personal injury matter. The parties would like to conduct some Discovery by obtaining and reviewing MLG&W's investigative file of the accident and then go to Mediation. The Court set scheduling dates. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Civil Jury Trial set for 5/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter, Mark Dodson) (mlk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Pretrial Order by Jacob R Elliott. (Leffler, Stephen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Leffler, Stephen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Benjamin Miller (Bradshaw, Victoria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Donald W. Boxx (Bradshaw, Victoria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Joshua T. Leggett (Bradshaw, Victoria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to John E. Shannon, Jr. (Bradshaw, Victoria)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Jacob R. Elliott (Bradshaw, Victoria)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY of Service of Certified Copy of Circuit Court File (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Circuit Court File)(Childress, Dennis)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 #10 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 12/3/2019. (bab)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Victoria R. Bradshaw Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3226367) by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing MS Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing USDC, Southern District of MS, #3 Certificate of Consultation Email confirmation of no objection by Plaintiff counsel)(Bradshaw, Victoria)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles H. Russell (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3226342) by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing MS Supreme Court, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing USDC, Southern District of MS, #3 Certificate of Consultation Email confirmation of no objection by Plaintiff counsel)(Russell,III, Charles)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Childress, Dennis)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, Complete 5-page Notice (Childress, Dennis)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY.(Childress, Dennis)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY from Circuit Court, Shelby County, TN, case number CT-4545-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3221530), filed by ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Affidavit of John Furlan, #3 Exhibit 3-Notice of Service of Process, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Childress, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott et al v. ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILLINOIS CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: Dennis Jason Childress
Represented By: Victoria Bradshaw
Represented By: Charles H. Russell,III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E Shannon, Jr
Represented By: Autumn B. Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Miller
Represented By: Autumn B. Chastain
Represented By: Stephen R. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald W Boxx
Represented By: Autumn B. Chastain
Represented By: Stephen R. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob R Elliott
Represented By: Autumn B. Chastain
Represented By: Stephen R. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua T Leggett
Represented By: Autumn B. Chastain
Represented By: Stephen R. Leffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?