Ahn et al v. Ragghianti et al
Plaintiff: John Ahn and Sonia Ahn
Defendant: Kevin Ragghianti, Farmers Insurance Company and Joseph Neyman
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02817
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Joseph Neyman, Kevin Ragghianti (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Spragins, Hal)
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Farmers Insurance Company (Joint Stipulation Pursuant to ADR Plan Rule 5.4(c) (Watson, Cameron)
January 16, 2020 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. ADR deadline is 4/7/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2020. Discovery due by 7/13/2020. Submission of selected mediator due by 1/24/2020. Motions due by 8/11/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2020. Jury Trial set for 11/16/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (Lipman, Sheryl)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/14/2020. (shl)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, November 16, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by October 30, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, November 6, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman.(smm)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: Scheduling Conference was held on 1/14/2020. William Joshua Cannon appeared for the plaintiff. Cameron M. Watson and Hal S. Spragins, Jr. appeared for defendants. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, November 16, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by October 30, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, November 6, 2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey)(smm)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal S. Spragins, Jr on behalf of Joseph Neyman, Kevin Ragghianti (Spragins, Hal)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonia Ahn, John Ahn as to Joseph Neyman. (Cannon, William)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Joshua Cannon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cannon, William)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 Summons Returned Executed filed by John Ahn has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: This summons is not one that was issued by the court. You published the summons executed that does not contain the signature and seal of the deputy clerk. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Ahn as to Joseph Neyman. (Greer, Thomas)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Watson, Cameron)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Farmers Insurance Company.(Watson, Cameron)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Joseph Neyman, Administrator. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 Amended Complaint filed by John Ahn, Sonia Ahn has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer failed to add additional defendants when publishing the amended complaint. Clerk's office will add omitted party. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Administrator, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Amended Complaint)(Greer, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farmers Insurance Company.(Watson, Cameron)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, January 14, 2020 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmers Insurance Company from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-4613-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3225022), filed by Farmers Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahn et al v. Ragghianti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ahn
Represented By: Thomas R. Greer
Represented By: William Joshua Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Ahn
Represented By: Thomas R. Greer
Represented By: William Joshua Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ragghianti
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance Company
Represented By: Cameron M. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Neyman
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?