Macks v. Extra Space Storage Inc
Plaintiff: Vicki G Macks and Phillip C Macks
Defendant: Extra Space Storage Inc
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02818
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for Friday, 8/28/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (Out-of-Towm Parties may participate by telephone: teleconference call-in# 877-848-7030; Access Code: 9411050. Please email case manager Ross Herrin if you would like to participate by phone).(wrh)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/09/2020. (Fowlkes, John)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/28/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR (Early Mediation) deadline is 4/2/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2020. Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 2/3/2020. Motions due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/09/2020. (Fowlkes, John)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 1/9/2020. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the current status of the case. The Court accepts the proposed Scheduling Order and sets an Early Mediation deadline of April 2, 22020; Orders to be entered. Case set Friday, 08/28/2020 at 9:15 a.m. for Status Conference. (Plaintiff: Eliassa Mulrooney Coombs)(Defense: Megan Calme) (Court Reporter Mark Dodson.) (wrh)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Coombs, Elissa)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 12/19/19. (Fowlkes, J.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3242391) by Extra Space Storage Inc. (Calme, Megan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for THURSDAY, 1/9/2020 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes' scheduling guidelines on JUDGE FOWLKES' WEBSITE @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #5 Amended Document filed by Extra Space Storage Inc has been filed. For future reference, please note "Wet signature" on the civil cover sheet. Please see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 electroniic signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Extra Space Storage Inc.(Melcher, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Extra Space Storage Inc. Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Melcher, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Extra Space Storage Inc has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: "Wet Signature", see ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Extra Space Storage Inc. (Melcher, Jeffrey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Extra Space Storage Inc from Shelby Court Circuit Court of Tennessee, case number CT-4528-19 Div. VIII (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3225470), filed by Extra Space Storage Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Melcher, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macks v. Extra Space Storage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki G Macks
Represented By: Elissa Mulrooney Coombs
Represented By: David E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip C Macks
Represented By: Elissa Mulrooney Coombs
Represented By: David E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extra Space Storage Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Melcher
Represented By: Megan Calme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?