Evans v. Sams East Inc
Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Evans
Defendant: Sams East Inc
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02830
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Sandra Kay Evans OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Wade, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Sam's West, Inc. on 12/02/2019, filed by Sandra Kay Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card Returned)(Wade, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Sam's East, Inc. on 12/02/2019, filed by Sandra Kay Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card Returned)(Wade, John)
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sams East Inc Service of Defendant's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures and First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiff Sandra Kay Evans (Frulla, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton assigned as presiding judge. Judge Jon Phipps McCalla no longer assigned to case. (jae)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/18/;2019. (mom) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/18/2019) (mom). Modified on 12/18/2019. Replaced to correct document format. (mom).
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Frulla, William)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sams East Inc identifying Corporate Parent Sams East Inc for Sams East Inc.. (Frulla, William)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Sams East Inc.(Frulla, William)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sams East Inc from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4874-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3229608), filed by Sams East Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Frulla, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Sams East Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kay Evans
Represented By: John P. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sams East Inc
Represented By: William Christopher Frulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?