Cottrell v. Family Dollar Store et al
Plaintiff: Aurelia Cottrell
Defendant: University FD, LLC., Family Dollar Store and Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02838
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/27/2020. (mom)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/27/2020. (mom)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aurelia Cottrell (Jewel, Gary)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying #10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/14/2020. (mom)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SUBSTITUTING THE CORRECT DEFENDANT, ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY FD, LLC, AND ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/8/2020. (mom)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: The Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/29/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/8/2020. Gary Jewell appeared for the Plaintiff. Ronald L. Harper appeared for the Defendant. Parties granted more time to prepare for scheduling conference. Therefore, the Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/29/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Kristy Farley, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Proposed Order Submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint to Recover Damages for Personal Injury)(Jewel, Gary)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday,1/8/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the instructions on the Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic conference. (jrs)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Family Dollar Store.(Harper, Ronald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Dollar Store. (Harper, Ronald)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Family Dollar Store from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-4698-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3231623), filed by Family Dollar Store. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A Amended Complaint to Recover Damages for Personal Injury, #3 Exhibit Ex B Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex C Division of Business Services Filing Information, #5 Exhibit Ex D Summons)(Harper, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottrell v. Family Dollar Store et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University FD, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Store
Represented By: Ronald L. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald L. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelia Cottrell
Represented By: Gary Jewell
Represented By: Gary L Jewel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?