Ingram v. Electrolux
Plaintiff: Sheena Ingram
Defendant: Electrolux
Case Number: 2:2019cv02842
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ORDER - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Scheduling Conference RESET for Wednesday, 2/19/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for THURSDAY, 2/6/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines on Judge Fowlkes' website @ https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux identifying Corporate Parent Electrolux North America, Inc. for Electrolux.. (Grisham, J.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Electrolux.(Grisham, J.)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheena Ingram as to Electrolux. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Electrolux. Issued summonses give to plaintiff for service.(agj)
December 9, 2019 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Signed NOTICE of Agreement to Receive Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by Sheena Ingram (agj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: $ 400.00, receipt number M4676044343 (agj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Electrolux (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Sheena Ingram.(agj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 Exhibit judges' cards) (agj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Electrolux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux
Represented By: J. Gregory Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheena Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?