Long v. Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn Long
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. and Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02856
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
2 Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Irons, Pamela)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting re (10 in 2:19-cv-02856-SHM-tmp) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. and Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation. Defendants' answer due January 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 01/28/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02856-SHM-tmp, 2:19-cv-02323-SHM-tmp(Mays, Samuel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr added. Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr no longer assigned to case. (jld)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE from Judge Fowlkes to Judge Mays. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/22/2020. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-02323-JTF-tmp, 2:19-cv-02856-JTF-tmp(Fowlkes, John)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE from Judge Fowlkes to Judge Mays. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 01/22/2020. (Fowlkes, John)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. Prather on behalf of All Defendants (Prather, Paul)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER [NO IMAGE ATTACHED] - Granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 1/9/20. (Fowlkes, J.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Consultation)(Irons, Pamela)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Long as to Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.. (Mikel, Donna)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Long as to Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation. (Mikel, Donna)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation, Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3237823), filed by Kathryn Long. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to BMMG, #3 Summons Summons to BMHCC)(Mikel, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela R. Irons
Represented By: Paul E. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation
Represented By: Pamela R. Irons
Represented By: Paul E. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Long
Represented By: Donna J. Mikel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?