Holbrook et al v. Ownbrix International Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Holbrook, Matt Holbrook, Brad Holbrook and Lorraine Holbrook
Defendant: Mark Marshall, Memphis RPF LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation, Oliver Marshall, Trading Technologies USA LLC, Lorraine Marshall and Advantage Property Management, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2019cv02879
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Cox on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cox, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Filing 37 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #35 Amended Complaint filed by Brad Holbrook, Lorraine Holbrook, Matt Holbrook, Rachel Holbrook has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer failed to add additional party (Advantage Property Management, LLC) to the docket. Clerk's office has now added that party. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jae)
February 14, 2020 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Advantage Property Management, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
February 13, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Brundick, Edward)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/11/2020. (mom)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND THEIR COMPLAINT; AND ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(b)(1) MOTIONS TO DISMISS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 2/11/2020. (mom)
February 10, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Attachment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1st Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1st Amended Complaint)(Brundick, Edward)
February 7, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff Brad Holbrook)(Brundick, Edward)
February 4, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by Brad Holbrook (Brundick, Edward)
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery (proposed order submitted) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cox, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lorraine Marshall, Mark Marshall, Oliver Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Martin, Laura)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/30/2020. (mom)
January 22, 2020 Filing 26 SETTING LETTER: The Non-Jury trial is set for Monday, 11/30/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Monday, 11/23/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 11/16/2020. (jrs)
January 21, 2020 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Scheduling Conference held on 1/21/2020. Edward Brundick appeared for the Plaintiff. Laura S. Martin and Abbie Stovall Hale appeared for the Defendants. Case and schedule reviewed. Non-Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/30/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 3-4 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Monday, 11/23/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 11/16/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Korian Neal, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
January 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbie Stovall Hale on behalf of Lorraine Marshall, Mark Marshall, Oliver Marshall (Hale, Abbie)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/21/2020. (mom)
January 20, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery (proposed order submitted) by All Defendants. (Martin, Laura)
January 20, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Extend Deadline (Proposed Order Submitted) by Lorraine Marshall, Mark Marshall, Oliver Marshall. (Martin, Laura)
January 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura S. Martin on behalf of Lorraine Marshall, Mark Marshall, Oliver Marshall (Martin, Laura)
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Martin, Laura)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Memphis RPF LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation, Trading Technologies USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Declaration of William Johnson)(Martin, Laura)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Holbrook as to Trading Technologies USA LLC. (Cox, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Holbrook as to Ownbrix International Corporation. (Cox, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Holbrook as to Memphis RPF LLC. (Cox, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Holbrook as to Mark Marshall. (Cox, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Holbrook as to Lorraine Marshall. (Cox, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brad Holbrook as to Oliver Marshall. (Cox, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 1/21/2020 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Please follow the call instructions on the attached Notice of Setting to gain access to the telephonic hearing. (jrs)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Ownbrix International Corporation, Memphis RPF, LLC, and Trading Technologies USA, LLC, shall file their responses to the Complaint by no later than January 10, 2020 (1/10/2020). Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/26/2019.
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbie Stovall Hale on behalf of Memphis RPF LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation, Trading Technologies USA LLC (Hale, Abbie)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Memphis RPF LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation, Trading Technologies USA LLC. (Martin, Laura)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Memphis RPF LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation, Trading Technologies USA LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Circuit Court Records are not attached.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Memphis RPF LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation, Trading Technologies USA LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Return, #2 Summons Return, #3 Summons Return)(Martin, Laura)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Memphis RPF LLC, Trading Technologies USA LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation from Circuit Court of Shelby County Tennessee, case number CT-5067-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3244186), filed by Memphis RPF LLC, Trading Technologies USA LLC, Ownbrix International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holbrook et al v. Ownbrix International Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Holbrook
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Represented By: Edward Brundick
Represented By: Edward L. Brundick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Holbrook
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Represented By: Edward Brundick
Represented By: Edward L. Brundick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Holbrook
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Represented By: Edward Brundick
Represented By: Edward L. Brundick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Holbrook
Represented By: Robert A. Cox
Represented By: Edward Brundick
Represented By: Edward L. Brundick, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Marshall
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Abbie Stovall Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis RPF LLC
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Abbie Stovall Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ownbrix International Corporation
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Abbie Stovall Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Marshall
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Abbie Stovall Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading Technologies USA LLC
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Abbie Stovall Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Marshall
Represented By: Laura S. Martin
Represented By: Abbie Stovall Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Property Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?