Birge v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angel Birge
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02006
Filed: January 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 06/05/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Cate, Brandon)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER. Defendant's motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including March 2, 2020 to file its answer. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 2/18/2020. (Norris, Mark)
February 17, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Proposed Order Submitted To Chambers By E-Mail) by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Cate, Brandon)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon B. Cate on behalf of Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Cate, Brandon)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
January 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3250529), filed by Angel Birge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Dunlap, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birge v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandon B. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Birge
Represented By: John Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?