Haywood v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Cora M. Haywood
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 2:2020cv02055
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cora M. Haywood as to William Barr, United States Attorney General. (csf)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cora M. Haywood as to Megan J. Brennan. (csf)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Megan J. Brennan, U.S. Postmaster General. The filer is to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to William Barr United States Attorney General)(csf)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Stuart Canale United States Attorney. (jld)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Stuart Canale United States Attorney. (jld)
February 21, 2020 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Compel by Cora M. Haywood. (csf)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676045073 (csf)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 1/24/2020. (Norris, Mark)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cora M. Haywood. (csf)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT Americans With Disabilities Act of 1990, as codified, 42 U.S.C. 12112-12117 filed by Cora M. Haywood against Megan J. Brennan. (Attachments: #1 Right to Sue, #2 Duty to Supplement Continuing Violations (filed in case 18-2473 and request by filer to be docketed in this instant case), #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haywood v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora M. Haywood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?