Swavely v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terri D. Swavely
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02058
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Settlement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Sutherland, Kari)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/18/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
February 17, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3286451) by Terri D. Swavely. (Sadler, Paul)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 02/13/2020. (shl)
February 13, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, September 21, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 6-8 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, September 4, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, September 11, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
February 13, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: A Status/Scheduling Conference was held on 2/13/2020. On the phone was Paul L. Sadler for the plaintiff. Susanna Moore Moldoveanu, Amy Pepke and Kari L. Sutherland appeared for defendant. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #16 and Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #29 were granted. Jury Trial set for Monday, September 21, 2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 6-8 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, September 4, 2020. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, September 11, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) (smm)
February 11, 2020 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William Gage. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jld)
February 5, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Pepke on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Pepke, Amy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Susanna Moore Moldoveanu on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Moldoveanu, Susanna)
January 27, 2020 Filing 30 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Melissa A. Merk, Eileen Marie Somers and William M. Gage filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note: Filer failed to indicate in the docket text "proposed order submitted". If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
January 27, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Melissa A. Merk, Eileen Marie Somers and William M. Gage by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari)
January 27, 2020 Filing 28 SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for Thursday, February 13, 2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
January 24, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-24222. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 17, 2020 Filing 26 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2297) Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2825) Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2826) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2942) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (3053) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6824) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6998) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (7100) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2060) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #10 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2065) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #11 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2134) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #12 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2232) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #13 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2910) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, #14 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6860) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Timothy Ulatowski, #15 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6965) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Timothy Ulatowski, #16 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (7143) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/17/2020 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 25 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (3855) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6648) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6926) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (7123) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (3666) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (3792) Response to Motion to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (3814) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6830) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6956) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (7129) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2817) Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2818) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2931) Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (3024) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (5332) Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (5333) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (5482) Response Memo in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (5548) Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6852) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6960) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6876) Motion to Limit C. Bryce Bowling, #23 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6877) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #24 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2076) Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #25 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2098) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #26 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2140) Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #27 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (2253) Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Teri Longacre, #28 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6820) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion of Teri Longacre, #29 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (6969) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Teri Longacre, #30 Exhibit ECF #24 Continued - (7099) Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Reply of Teri Longacre)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/17/2020 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 24 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (238) First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit (239) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit (241) Master Answer and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit (262) Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit (263) Amended Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit (2047) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit (2047) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit (2047) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit (2047) Part 4 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit (2047) Part 5 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit (2047) Part 6 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit (2047) Part 7 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit (2047) Part 8 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit (2047) Part 9 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit (2047) Part 10 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit (2047) Part 11 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit (2047) Part 12 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit (2047) Part 13 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit (2047) Part 14 Motion to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit (2205) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #21 Exhibit (2205) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #22 Exhibit (2205) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #23 Exhibit (2287) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #24 Exhibit (2287) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven Maclean, #25 Exhibit (2552) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven MacLean, #26 Exhibit (2552) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven MacLean, #27 Exhibit (2552) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Steven MacLean, #28 Exhibit (3626) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #29 Exhibit (3626) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #30 Exhibit (3663) Part 1 Motion to Exclude Paul Michaels, #31 Exhibit (3663) Part 2 Motion to Exclude Paul Michaels, #32 Exhibit (3663) Part 3 Motion to Exclude Paul Michaels, #33 Exhibit (3767) Part 1 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #34 Exhibit (3767) Part 2 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #35 Exhibit (3767) Part 3 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #36 Exhibit (3767) Part 4 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #37 Exhibit (7020) Part 1 Motion to Limit C. Bryce Bowling, #38 Exhibit (7020) Part 2 Motion to Limit C. Bryce Bowling)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/17/2020 to add party filer)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 1/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 1/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Terri D. Swavely (Sadler, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Terri D. Swavely to #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment. (Sadler, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Terri D. Swavely. (Merk, Melissa) (Modified on 10/9/2018 to add party filer) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ORAL/VIDEO DEPOSITION by Terri D. Swavely of Dr. Robert L. Summitt on September 17, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. CST (Sadler, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendant's Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terri D. Swavely for Responses and/or Objections to Ethicon, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Sadler, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Terri D. Swavely for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Sadler, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Eileen Marie Somers on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Somers, Eileen) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Terri D. Swavely on June 14, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #4 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Robert L. Summit Jr. on 3/19/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Terri D. Swavely. (Sadler, Paul) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
August 1, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 130 (Hearing on Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted, or Alternatively, to Compel) entered on 07/30/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]
July 31, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3374430. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swavely v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Eileen Marie Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Eileen Marie Somers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri D. Swavely
Represented By: Paul L. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?