Campbell v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Maxine Campbell
Defendant: United States of America
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02095
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Roxana Rudolph on behalf of United States of America (Rudolph, Mary)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 05/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SUBSTITUTING UNITED STATES AS A DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 2/26/2020. (Norris, Mark)
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer with Supporting Memorandum by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Canale, Stuart)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Party proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Canale, Stuart)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Circuit Court of Tennessee Shelby County, case number CT-4446-19, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Canale, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Campbell
Represented By: Brittany Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Stuart J. Canale
Represented By: Mary Roxana Rudolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?