Muhammad v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS et al
Plaintiff: Edward Muhammad
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. as Substitute Trustee and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2020cv02139
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. as Substitute Trustee. (Lieber, Robert)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Edward Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Consultation)(Johnson, Curtis)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Edward Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law In Support of Response In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Johnson, Curtis)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Edward Muhammad. (Johnson, Curtis)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/13/2020. (bab)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Plaintiff moves to remand this case back to state court. (ECF No. 8.) But, in filing his motion, Plaintiff has failed to comply with Local Rule 7.2. This rule requires that [a]ll motions...be accompanied by a certificate of counsel affirming that, after consultation between the parties to the controversy, they are unable to reach an accord as to all issues or that all other parties are in agreement with the action requested by the motion. Because of this failure, the Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/19/2020. (bab)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. as Substitute Trustee of Consent to Removal (Lieber, Robert)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Verified Answer) by Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. as Substitute Trustee.(Lieber, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Default, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Acceleration, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Foreclosure Sale, #5 Exhibit D - Daily News Publication)(Drinkwater, Woods)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Edward Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law In Support)(Johnson, Curtis)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Computershare Limited, Other Affiliate Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Drinkwater, Woods)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS. (Drinkwater, Woods)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS from Shelby County Chancery, case number CH-20-0137 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3296428), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drinkwater, Woods)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Woods Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackie Wolf Zientz & Mann, P.C. as Substitute Trustee
Represented By: Robert Thomas Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for FFMLT 2007-FFB-SS, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-FFB-SS
Represented By: Woods Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Muhammad
Represented By: Curtis D. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?