Starks v. Owens
Petitioner: Trevis Starks
Respondent: Angela Owens
Case Number: 2:2020cv02182
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Filed in Opposition by Angela Owens. (Attachments: #1 "A" 1995 TN PWI, #2 "B" 99-09611 Judgment, #3 "C" 99-09609 Judgment, #4 "D" 2010 MS felon in possession)(Ritz, Kevin)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin G. Ritz on behalf of Angela Owens (Ritz, Kevin)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Respondent to Respond to the Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 04/17/2020. (kah)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case initiation fee: $ 5.00, receipt number M4676045396 (agj)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an In Forma Pauperis Affidavit and Trust Fund Account Statement or Pay the $5.00 Habeas Corpus Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 03/19/2020. (kah)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Trevis Starks against Angela Owens. (Attachments: #1 Envelope (Front and Back), #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starks v. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trevis Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angela Owens
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Represented By: Kevin G. Ritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?