Guthridge v. Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Guthridge
Defendant: Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02189
Filed: March 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: The Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/12/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 3/3/2021. (jrs)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/4/2020. Richard Liebowitz appeared for the Plaintiff. Adam Baldridge and Nicole Berkowitz appeared for the Defendant. Case reviewed. Protective order to be submitted. Defendant will submit by 5/8/2020 spread sheets, invoices, and other documents related to usage of photograph. Plaintiff to pursue documents related to licensing agreements. Plaintiff's answer is due by 5/26/2020. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 3/22/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 3 days. The Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 3/12/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. The Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 3/3/2021. A Scheduling Order will be entered. (Court Reporter:Traci Walker) (jrs)
April 26, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Berkowitz, Nicole)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 4/13/20. *TEXT ORDER ONLY* (aac)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Monday, 5/4/2020 at 10:30 AM (CT) before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole D. Berkowitz on behalf of Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. (Berkowitz, Nicole)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, -Proposed Order Submitted by Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. (Baldridge, Adam)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 3/20/19. (aac)
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Guthridge has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Civil cover sheet does not have the filer's electronic signature. Please resubmit with filer's electronic signature under the event "Notice of Correction". Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
March 15, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
March 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3308898) by Robert Guthridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B- Federal Certificate of Good Standing)(Liebowitz, Richard)
March 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beale Street Blues Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3308897), filed by Robert Guthridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthridge v. Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Guthridge
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beale Street Blues Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole D. Berkowitz
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?