Webb v. SN Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Raymond D Webb
Defendant: Madison Management Services and SN Servicing Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Gen. Sessions Clerk Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02217
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Runger, Curtis)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint proposed Order submitted by Raymond D Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Motion to Amend (proposed amended complaint))(Runger, Curtis)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Alan Runger on behalf of Raymond D Webb (Runger, Curtis)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] In response to the Court's order to show cause (ECF No. 7), Plaintiff's counsel refers to the need for more time to both amend the complaint and respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 6). (ECF No. 9.) But he has yet to move for this relief. So, without ruling on the merits of his request, the Court will provide Plaintiff two weeks from the entry of this Order--that is, until May 25, 2020--to file any motions or response he deems necessary. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/11/2020. (bab)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Raymond D Webb re #7 Order To Show Cause (Darnell, Clifton)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifton E. Darnell on behalf of Raymond D Webb (Darnell, Clifton)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/4/2020. (bab)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Madison Management Services, SN Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Chaness, Bret)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SN Servicing Corporation, Madison Management Services from Shelby County General Sessions, case number 2043956 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3315776), filed by SN Servicing Corporation, Madison Management Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" State Court Pleadings)(Chaness, Bret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. SN Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Management Services
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Bret Jacob Chaness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gen. Sessions Clerk Edward L. Stanton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond D Webb
Represented By: Clifton Darnell
Represented By: Curtis Alan Runger
Represented By: Clifton E. Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?