Westerkamp v. McNeill Hotel Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Cheryl Finn Westerkamp
Defendant: McNeill Hotel Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02269
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/20/2020. (bab)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cheryl Finn Westerkamp (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 14, 2020 Judge Unassigned 7 added. Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo no longer assigned to case. (agj)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] Defendant moves unopposed for an extension of time to answer to Plaintiff's complaint. (ECF No. 9). For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. Defendant shall have until June 8, 2020, to answer to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/11/2020. (bab)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Unopposed) proposed order submitted by McNeill Hotel Company, LLC. (Huseth, Emily)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Hamm Huseth on behalf of McNeill Hotel Company, LLC (Huseth, Emily)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of McNeill Hotel Company, LLC (Hughes, Brett)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to McNeill Hotel Company, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McNeill Hotel Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3324570), filed by Cheryl Finn Westerkamp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westerkamp v. McNeill Hotel Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Finn Westerkamp
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeill Hotel Company, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Hughes
Represented By: Emily Hamm Huseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?