Carter v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: James Brad Carter
Defendant: Jeffery Scott Davis, Terry Davis and Terry Davis d/b/a Terry Davis Auto Sales
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02358
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffery Scott Davis.(Jenkins, Forrest)
June 25, 2020 Filing 16 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Jeffery Scot Davis by James Brad Carter.(Chiozza, Louis)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Brad Carter as to Jeffery Scott Davis. (Chiozza, Louis)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Brad Carter as to Jeffery Scott Davis. (Chiozza, Louis)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Jeffery Scott Davis. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons by Louis P. Chiozza, Jr on behalf of James Brad Carter. (Chiozza, Louis)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Terry Davis Defendant Terry Davis d/b/a Terry Davis Auto Sales's Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Jenkins, Forrest)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Plaintiff by Terry Davis.(Jenkins, Forrest)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Jenkins, Forrest)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 INTERROGATORIES Propounded to Terry Davis, d/b/a Terry Davis Auto Sales by All Plaintiffs.(Chiozza, Louis)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 08/07/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Terry Davis.(Jenkins, Forrest)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (jld).
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-1510-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3351970), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenkins, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Scott Davis
Represented By: Forrest Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Davis
Represented By: Forrest Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Davis d/b/a Terry Davis Auto Sales
Represented By: Forrest Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brad Carter
Represented By: Louis P. Chiozza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?