Main Street America Assurance Company v. Marble Solutions LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Defendant: Marble Solutions, LLC, Daniel Hosea Waller, Adrian McGlown and Carlin McGlown
Case Number: 2:2020cv02411
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 10/02/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Marble Solutions, LLC, Adrian McGlown, Carlin McGlown.(Taylor, Stephen)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendant Daniel Hosea Waller by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of request for entry of default judgment)(Lowe, Hannah)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT. Marble Solutions, LLC answer due 7/27/2020; Adrian McGlown answer due 7/27/2020; Carlin McGlown answer due 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 7/21/2020. (Norris, Mark)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Proposed Order Submitted by Marble Solutions, LLC, Adrian McGlown, Carlin McGlown. (Taylor, Stephen)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant Daniel Hosea Waller filed by Main Street America Assurance Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer selected the incorrect event. There is an event for "Entry of Default." Please resubmit your motion under the correct event (document is titled correctly). Motion at DE 13 will be termed pending correct submission. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (btg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant Daniel Hosea Waller by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of request for default judgment)(Lowe, Hannah)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Scott Taylor on behalf of Marble Solutions, LLC, Adrian McGlown, Carlin McGlown (Taylor, Stephen)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company as to Adrian McGlown. (Lowe, Hannah)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company as to Carlin McGlown. (Lowe, Hannah)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company as to Marble Solutions, LLC. (Lowe, Hannah)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Main Street America Assurance Company as to Daniel Hosea Waller. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Marble Solutions, LLC, Adrian McGlown, Carlin McGlown, Daniel Hosea Waller. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons)(jae)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Wayne Ward on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company (Ward, Kenneth)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3366253), filed by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Marble Solutions LLC, #3 Summons for Carlin McGlown, #4 Summons for Adrian McGlown, #5 Summons for Daniel Hosea Waller, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certified Policy, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Third Amended Petition filed in Travis County, TX, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - ROR letter to Daniel Waller, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - ROR letter to Mr. and Mrs. McGlown)(Lowe, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street America Assurance Company v. Marble Solutions LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth Wayne Ward
Represented By: Hannah S. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marble Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hosea Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian McGlown
Represented By: Stephen Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlin McGlown
Represented By: Stephen Scott Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?