Hohenberg et al v. Shelby County, Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Hohenberg and Joseph Hanson
Defendant: Shelby County, Tennessee, City of Memphis, Tennessee and Division 14 of the Shelby County, Tennessee, General Sessions Court, Criminal Division
Case Number: 2:2020cv02432
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Samuel H Mays
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Shelby County, Tennessee.(Frazier, Katherine)
August 14, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Division 14 of the Shelby County, Tennessee, General Sessions Court, Criminal Division. (Frazier, Katherine)
August 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Frazier on behalf of Division 14 of the Shelby County, Tennessee, General Sessions Court, Criminal Division (Frazier, Katherine)
August 10, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(McMullen, Bruce)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/21/2020. Defendant City of Memphis, Tennessee's answer or responsive pleading is due on 8/10/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/21/2020. Defendant Shelby County, Tennessee's answer or responsive pleading is due on 8/14/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer City of Memphis's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (proposed order submitted) by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Tullis, Mary)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Wu Tullis on behalf of City of Memphis, Tennessee (Tullis, Mary)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine L. Roberts on behalf of City of Memphis, Tennessee (Roberts, Kristine)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce McMullen on behalf of City of Memphis, Tennessee (McMullen, Bruce)
July 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Shelby County, Tennessee. (Durrence, Jasen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasen McCoy Durrence on behalf of Shelby County, Tennessee (Durrence, Jasen)
July 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Neely on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neely, Keith)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs.(Maurer, William)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce S. Kramer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kramer, Bruce)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Peccola on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Peccola, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine L. Frazier on behalf of Shelby County, Tennessee (Frazier, Katherine)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy H. Chockley, Jr on behalf of Shelby County, Tennessee (Chockley, Roy)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Hohenberg, Joseph Hanson as to Division 14 of the Shelby County, Tennessee, General Sessions Court, Criminal Division. (Maurer, William)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Hohenberg, Joseph Hanson as to City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Maurer, William)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Hohenberg, Joseph Hanson as to Shelby County, Tennessee. (Maurer, William)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to City of Memphis, Tennessee. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Division 14 of the Shelby County, Tennessee, General Sessions Court, Criminal Division. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Shelby County, Tennessee. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3371248), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Shelby County, #3 Summons Environmental Court, #4 Summons City of Memphis)(Maurer, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hohenberg et al v. Shelby County, Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County, Tennessee
Represented By: Roy H. Chockley, Jr.
Represented By: Jasen McCoy Durrence
Represented By: Katherine L. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis, Tennessee
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Mary Wu Tullis
Represented By: Kristine L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division 14 of the Shelby County, Tennessee, General Sessions Court, Criminal Division
Represented By: Katherine L. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Hohenberg
Represented By: William R. Maurer
Represented By: Keith Neely
Represented By: Bruce S. Kramer
Represented By: Robert Peccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hanson
Represented By: William R. Maurer
Represented By: Keith Neely
Represented By: Bruce S. Kramer
Represented By: Robert Peccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?