Creative Business, Inc. v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Creative Business, Inc. and Creative Business, Inc. d/b/a Blues Hall Dining Room d/b/a Rum Boogie Cafe, individually and behalf of all others similary situated
Defendant: Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC, Covington Specialty Insurance Company and RSUI Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02452
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne D. Taylor on behalf of Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC, Covington Specialty Insurance Company, RSUI Indemnity Company (Taylor, Wayne)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Alameda Sherman on behalf of Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC, Covington Specialty Insurance Company, RSUI Indemnity Company (Sherman, Michelle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Creative Business, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Redacted Ins. Policy)(Sanderson, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. (agj)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 and #12 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 8/11/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3405930) by Creative Business, Inc.. (Brown, Tucker)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3405910) by Creative Business, Inc.. (Whatley, Joe)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC, RSUI Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendants RSUI Indemnity Company and Alleghany Insurance Holdings, Inc. to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Box, Bradford)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Covington Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendant Covington Specialty Insurance Company to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Box, Bradford)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 7/7/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3382445) by Creative Business, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheehan, Patrick)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RSUI Indemnity Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Covington Specialty Insurance Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Creative Business, Inc. has been filed., Please note the civil cover sheet is missing the attorney's s/signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (jld)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3375900), filed by Creative Business, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #2 Summons Alleghany Summons, #3 Summons Covington Summons, #4 Summons RSUI Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civ. Cover Sheet)(Sanderson, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Business, Inc. v. Covington Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alleghany Insurance Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bradford David Box
Represented By: Michelle Alameda Sherman
Represented By: Wayne D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covington Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradford David Box
Represented By: Michelle Alameda Sherman
Represented By: Wayne D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Represented By: Bradford David Box
Represented By: Michelle Alameda Sherman
Represented By: Wayne D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Business, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lucas Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Business, Inc. d/b/a Blues Hall Dining Room d/b/a Rum Boogie Cafe, individually and behalf of all others similary situated
Represented By: Jeffrey Lucas Sanderson
Represented By: Joe R Whatley
Represented By: Tucker Brown
Represented By: Patrick Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?