Dickerson v. Hall
Defendant: Hilton Hall, Jr.
Petitioner: Marvin Dickerson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02506
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Se NOTICE of copy of payment voucher for $5.00 filing fee by Marvin Dickerson (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Mail #3 Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marvin Dickerson. (jae)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Marvin Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jld)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of Hilton Hall, Jr (Douglas, Richard)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Petitioner to File an In Forma Pauperis Affidavit and Trust Fund Account Statement or Pay the $5.00 Habeas Corpus Filing Fee. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 07/20/2020. (kah)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Marvin Dickerson against Hilton Hall, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2020: #2 Judicial Cards) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?