Huffman v. Shelby County
Petitioner: LaQuita Huffman
Respondent: Shelby County and Anthony Alexander
Case Number: 2:2020cv02520
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Lewis Barker on behalf of Anthony Alexander (Barker, Zachary)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET, DENYING LEAVE TO AMEND, AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD AND TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/9/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) Modified on 9/9/2020 (Lipman, Sheryl).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/3/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LaQuita Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - trust fund statement, #2 envelope)(jae)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff.(cdi)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE (filed as motion to correct sentence) by LaQuita Huffman (Attachments: #1 Petition for Shelby Co Criminal court, #2 envelope)(jae)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/21/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Scott Bolduc on behalf of Shelby County (Bolduc, Nicholas) Modified on 7/17/2020 to correct that atty represented the defendant instead of the plaintiff per 7/17/20 Helpdesk e-mail (cdi).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by LaQuita Huffman against Shelby County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Shelby County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LaQuita Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shelby County
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bolduc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Alexander
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Bolduc
Represented By: Zachary Lewis Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?