LAFAYETTE v. EXEL, INC.
Plaintiff: CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE
Defendant: DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. and Exel Inc. doing business as DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Case Number: 2:2020cv02521
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 9/30/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 8/26/2020. (aac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Dowdy on behalf of Exel Inc. (Dowdy, Whitney)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue /Reset Telephonic Scheduling Conference for a Later Date (proposed order submitted) by Exel Inc.. (Busey, Zachary)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Exel Inc. (Busey, Zachary)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Exel Inc., filed by CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE.(Jackson, Gordon)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff.(cdi)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 9/2/2020 at 2:15 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE (Turner, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE. DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC. waiver sent on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Morelli, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Morelli, III on behalf of CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE (Morelli, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Russ Bryant on behalf of CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE (Bryant, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. Filer should also insert attorney to be served answer, as it was omitted on summons. (jae)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (jae)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3391552), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued, #3 Exhibit A - Lafayette Consent to Join)(Jackson, Gordon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAFAYETTE v. EXEL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANDRELLE LAFAYETTE
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Robert E. Morelli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL EXPRESS (USA), INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exel Inc. doing business as DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Represented By: Whitney Dowdy
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?