Hill v. Perry, Warden
Petitioner: Shaun Royale Hill and Shaun Royal Hill
Respondent: Grady Perry, Warden
Case Number: 2:2020cv02522
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Service - Correction by Grady Perry, Warden. (Bledsoe, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 INDEX OF STATE COURT RECORD by Grady Perry, Warden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical record of trial proceedings, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #2 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 1, Preliminary Hearing, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #3 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 2, Hearing on Motion for Continuance, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #4 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 3, Trial, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #5 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 4, Trial, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #6 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 5, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #7 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 6, Trial, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #8 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 7, Sentencing Hearing, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #9 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence, volume 8, Hearing on Motion for New Trial, Tipton County Circuit Court No. 7697., #10 Exhibit Exhibits, #11 Exhibit Brief of appellant, Shaun Royal Hill, filed in Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on direct appeal., #12 Exhibit Brief of appellee, State of Tennessee, filed in Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on direct appeal, #13 Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on direct appeal: State of Tennessee v. Shaun Royal Hill, No. W2015-00710-CCA-R3-CD, 2016 WL 3351817 (Tenn. Crim. App. June 9, 2016), perm. app. denied (Tenn. Sep. 23, 2016)., #14 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on direct appeal: State of Tennessee v. Shaun Royal Hill, No. W2015-00710-CCA-R3-CD, 2016 WL 3351817 (Tenn. Crim. App. June 9, 2016), perm. app. denied (Tenn. Sep. 23, 2016)., #15 Exhibit States no-response letter on application for permission to appeal to Tennessee Supreme Court on direct appeal., #16 Exhibit Order by Tennessee Supreme Court denying Rule 11 application, #17 Exhibit Technical Record of Post-Conviction Proceedings, #18 Exhibit Transcript of Evidence from Post-Conviction Proceedings, #19 Exhibit Brief of Appellant, Shaun Royal Hill, filed in Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on post-conviction appeal., #20 Exhibit Brief of Appellee, State of Tennessee, filed in Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on post-conviction appeal., #21 Exhibit Opinion of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on post-conviction review: Shaun Royal Hill v. State of Tennessee, No. W2019-00240-CCA-R3-PC, 2019 WL 5957292 (Tenn. Crim. App. Nov. 8, 2019)., #22 Exhibit Judgment of Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals: Shaun Royal Hill v. State of Tennessee, No. W2019-00240-CCA-R3-PC, 2019 WL 5957292 (Tenn. Crim. App. Nov. 8, 2019).)(Bledsoe, John)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 9/17/2020. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 8/20/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED by Grady Perry, Warden. (Bledsoe, John)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2020-31 referral judge reassigned to Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff. (cdi)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Bledsoe on behalf of Grady Perry, Warden (Bledsoe, John)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD AND TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 7/21/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 1:20-cv-00036. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #2 judges cards) (agj).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Petitioner Shaun Royale Hill, a state inmate incarcerated in the South Central Correctional Facility in Clifton, Tennessee, filed a pro se petition for the writ of habeas corpus and has paid the filing fee. He seeks relief under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Petitioner challenges a conviction that was entered in Tipton County, Tennessee, which lies within the geographical territory of the Western Division of the Western District of Tennessee, which sits in Memphis. 28 U.S.C. 123(c)(2). Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/17/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]
June 24, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Davison Douglas. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of Grady Perry, Warden (Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIPT #34675059140 in the amount of $5 posted by Shaun Royale Hill re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shaun Royale Hill.(mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 7/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Perry, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaun Royale Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shaun Royal Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Grady Perry, Warden
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Represented By: John H. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?