Drewery v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jeremy Phillip Drewery
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02531
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 PRO SE MOTION to Correct AUSA's misstatement by Jeremy Phillip Drewery. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/14/2020. The government is granted an extension of 30 days after the receipt of the trial transcripts to file its amended response to Defendants motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (Mays, Samuel)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Erskine on behalf of United States of America (Erskine, Mark)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Pro Se Complaint, #3 Order w/ proposed order submitted by United States of America. (Fondren, Reagan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Reagan Fondren on behalf of United States of America (Fondren, Reagan)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing United States to Respond, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 07/22/2020. (Mays, Samuel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by Jeremy Phillip Drewery against United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2020: #3 Judicial Cards) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drewery v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA
Represented By: Mark Alan Erskine
Represented By: Reagan Fondren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Phillip Drewery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?