Billingsley v. DOE-1 et al
Plaintiff: Deaundra Billingsley
Defendant: JOHN DOE-2, CITY OF MEMPHIS (MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT), Michael W. Rallings, Prentiss Jolly and JOHN DOE-1
Case Number: 2:2020cv02570
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(McMullen, Bruce)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #22 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. Defendants' motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants may file a memorandum in support of their motion of up to 40 pages. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/29/2020. (Norris, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (McMullen, Bruce)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Decl. JWB, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Decl. JWB, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Decl. JWB) (Brown, Jacob)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #19 DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER OR RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Defendants' motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including September 17, 2020 to file an answer or responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/3/2020. (Norris, Mark)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Answer or Responsive Pleading - proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (McMullen, Bruce)
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lan Chen on behalf of All Defendants (Chen, Lan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie Vee Silk on behalf of All Defendants (Silk, Jennie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce McMullen on behalf of All Defendants (McMullen, Bruce)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deaundra Billingsley as to CITY OF MEMPHIS (MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT). (Kramer, Bruce)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deaundra Billingsley as to CITY OF MEMPHIS (MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT). (Kramer, Bruce)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deaundra Billingsley as to Prentiss Jolly. (Kramer, Bruce)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deaundra Billingsley as to Michael W. Rallings. (Kramer, Bruce)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Michael W. Rallings, Prentiss Jolly, City of Memphis (Memphis Police Department). The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(btg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 Notice (Other) filed by Deaundra Billingsley, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Deaundra Billingsley, #8 Notice (Other) filed by Deaundra Billingsley has been filed. For future reference, please note Summons to be issued were filed under the wrong event; Summons to be issued by the Clerk shall be docketed under the Notice of Summons event. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (btg)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Deaundra Billingsley Summons to The City of Memphis (Kramer, Bruce)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Deaundra Billingsley Summons to Prentiss Jolly (Kramer, Bruce)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Deaundra Billingsley Summons to Director Rallings (Kramer, Bruce)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce S. Kramer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kramer, Bruce)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3406087), filed by Deaundra Billingsley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley v. DOE-1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-2
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Jennie Vee Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MEMPHIS (MEMPHIS POLICE DEPARTMENT)
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Jennie Vee Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Rallings
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Jennie Vee Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prentiss Jolly
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Jennie Vee Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-1
Represented By: Lan Chen
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Jennie Vee Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deaundra Billingsley
Represented By: Jacob Webster Brown
Represented By: Bruce S. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?