Protect Our Aquifer et al v. Tennessee Valley Authority
Plaintiff: Protect Our Aquifer, Appalachian Voices and Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy doing business as Energy Alabama
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv02615
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Annie T Christoff
2 Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protect Our Aquifer, Appalachian Voices, Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Cert. Mail Receipt to Lyash)(Nolan, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protect Our Aquifer, Appalachian Voices, Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy. All Defendants. U.S. Attorney served on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Cert. Mail Receipt for U.S. Att.)(Nolan, George)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protect Our Aquifer, Appalachian Voices, Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy. All Defendants. U.S. Attorney General served on 08/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Cert. Mail Receipt - Att. Gen. Barr)(Nolan, George)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Bowling on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bowling, Chelsea)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rosemary Garcia on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Garcia, Amanda)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by O. W. Bussey, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bussey, O.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Tennessee Valley Authority, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 William Barr Summons, #2 Michael Dunavant Summons)(jae)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T Christoff added. (jae)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3414299), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for TVA c/o Jeffery J. Lyash, #3 Summons for TVA c/o U.S. Attorney Western District of Tennessee, #4 Summons for TVA c/o U.S. Attorney General William Barr, #5 Exhibit A - TVA's October 3. 2019 Response to VEC's Request for Proposal, #6 Exhibit B - TVA's Long-Term Agreement Form, #7 Exhibit C - Minutes of Meeting of TVA Board of Directors - August 22, 2019)(Nolan, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protect Our Aquifer et al v. Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Valley Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protect Our Aquifer
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Represented By: O. W. Bussey, III
Represented By: Chelsea Bowling
Represented By: Amanda Rosemary Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Appalachian Voices
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Represented By: O. W. Bussey, III
Represented By: Chelsea Bowling
Represented By: Amanda Rosemary Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Center for Sustainable Energy doing business as Energy Alabama
Represented By: George H. Nolan
Represented By: O. W. Bussey, III
Represented By: Chelsea Bowling
Represented By: Amanda Rosemary Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?