Preyer v. Investor Nation Residential Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lilla Yvette Preyer
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC and Investor Nation Residential Capital, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2020cv02621
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: John T Fowlkes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for Thursday, 3/25/2021 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference 1 day prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Ross Herrin at ross_herrin@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (wrh)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Due to the entry of the Scheduling Order & Order for Mediation, the Scheduling Conference set Tuesday, 10/20/2020 is CANCELLED. A Status Conference will be set via separate notice.
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/15/2020. (Fowlkes, John)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 09:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 2/8/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020. Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020. Motions due by 4/15/2021.. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/15/2020. (Fowlkes, John)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/20/2020 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. PLEASE FOLLOW INSTRUCTIONS FOR SCHEDULING ON JUDGE FOWLKES' WEBSITE @https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (ljf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Amended Petition by Investor Nation Residential Capital, LLC.(Crislip, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 05-05-19 Notice of Default, #2 Exhibit B - 07-18-19 Notice of Default, #3 Exhibit C - 08-28-19 Notice of Acceleration)(Roberts, Lauren)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-20-0805, Part II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3416453), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state court filings, #2 Exhibit B - state court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preyer v. Investor Nation Residential Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Paxton Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investor Nation Residential Capital, LLC
Represented By: James A. Crislip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilla Yvette Preyer
Represented By: James A. Crislip, Jr
Represented By: Van Davis Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?