Buckley v. Montgomery et al
Plaintiff: Hilton Buckley
Defendant: Tyreace Montgomery and Justin Roberts
Case Number: 2:2020cv02633
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/8/2020. (ejc)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE, DISMISSING CASE, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH, AND NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF APPELLATE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/4/2020. (mbm)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hilton Buckley. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/3/2020) (mbm).
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hilton Buckley. (Attachments: #1 DE#4 Order, #2 envelope)(mbm) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/3/2020) (mbm).
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hilton Buckley. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(jae)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tyreace Montgomery, Justin Roberts, filed by Hilton Buckley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(jae)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing by Hilton Buckley re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 OMS report, #2 envelope)(mbm)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) AND TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/21/2020. (mbm)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Hilton Buckley. (csf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Hilton Buckley against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Incident Report, #2 Envelope, #3 Original Judicial Card, #4 Reassigned Judicial Cards)(csf)
August 19, 2020 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-01 case reassigned to Judge James D. Todd. Judge Sheryl H. Lipman no longer assigned to case. (csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Montgomery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyreace Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?