Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District v. City of Memphis, Tennessee
Plaintiff: Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District and Desoto County, Mississippi
Defendant: City of Memphis Tennessee
Case Number: 2:2020cv02641
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Stay re #46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Orlansky, William)
October 16, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Orlansky, William)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #51 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE. Plaintiffs' motion is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including October 16, 2020 to file their response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/5/2020. (Norris, Mark)
October 5, 2020 Filing 51 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline by Desoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Orlansky, William)
September 11, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmalita Philina Carletos-Drayton on behalf of City of Memphis Tennessee (Carletos-Drayton, Carmalita)
September 9, 2020 Filing 49 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 12/04/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
September 9, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Wu Tullis on behalf of City of Memphis Tennessee (Tullis, Mary)
September 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Pete A. Brunson on behalf of City of Memphis Tennessee (Brunson, Pete)
September 8, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by City of Memphis Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(McMullen, Bruce)
August 24, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
August 24, 2020 Filing 44 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00290. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #2 Judicial assignment card) (jae).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #12 Motion to Change Venue; terminating as moot #6 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/24/2020. (jtm) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Case Transferred to Western District of Tennessee. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/29/2020. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/29/20. (ncb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 1/24/2022 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (sko) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/6/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/29/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/26/2021. Motions due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/29/2020. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 5/27/2020. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #35 Reply to Response to Motion, #31 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Amended Motion to Transfer filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Amended Motion to Transfer filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #33 Response in Opposition to Motion re #31 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Amended Motion to Transfer, filed by DeSoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Orlansky, William) Modified on 5/26/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 25, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Amended Motion to Transfer filed by DeSoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange Among Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Memphis' Response to Stay in Tennessee Action) (Orlansky, William) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #31 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Amended Motion to Transfer filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on Amended Motion to Transfer by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Differences in Rules, #2 Exhibit Good Faith Certificate) (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 14, 2020 ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to submit Rule 16 Initial Order documents by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (ncb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting unopposed Oral Motion for Extension of Time to submit Rule 16 Initial Order documents. The parties' deadline is extended to May 20, 2020. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/14/20. (ncb)(no document attached) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/8/2020. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Status Conference held on 5/8/2020. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference RESET for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Greenville Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Call-in information will be provided via email. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
March 26, 2020 NOTICE of Conference: #23 Status Conference RESET for 4/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #26 Reply to Response to Motion, #12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue . (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply (until 2/26/2020) Replies due by 2/26/2020. No further written order shall issue by this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/19/2020. (no document attached)(ray) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 14, 2020 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference RESET for 4/8/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (ncb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 EXHIBIT re #8 Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement btw Memphis and HLBISD, #2 Exhibit B - Supp Agreement with Memphis (Industry), #3 Exhibit C - 3-28-18 Ltr from City of Memphis, #4 Exhibit D - 10-10-18 Ltr from Memphis to Mayors) (Orlansky, William) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 13, 2020 NOTICE of Conference: #23 Status Conference RESET for 4/6/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiff's counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-335-9214. (irw) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #21 Response in Opposition to Motion, re #12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by DeSoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Orlansky, William) Modified on 3/10/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by DeSoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6-19-18 Letter from Mary Lee Brown to McMullan, #2 Exhibit 2 - 12-3-18 HLCBSID Letter to Mayor Strickland, #3 Exhibit 3 - E-mail from M. Brown to C. D. Draydon, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Mary Lee Brown, #5 Exhibit 5 - E-mail from C.C. Drayton re 12-11 Meeting - Complain Courtesy Copy, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Returned Executed on Horn Lake District, #7 Exhibit 7 - Answer of Desoto County, MS in Tenn. Acgtion, #8 Exhibit 8 - Answer of Horn Lake District in Tenn. Action) (Orlansky, William) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Stay. A telephone status conference will be set in this matter for April 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/12/20. (ncb) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 Reply to Response to Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue Or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary L. Brown on behalf of Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District (Brown, Mary) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William A. Brown on behalf of Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District (Brown, William) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Defendant's #6 Motion to Transfer Venue Or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue . (Orlansky, William) Modified on 2/3/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Defendant's #6 Motion to Transfer Venue Or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by DeSoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Scheduling Conference) (Orlansky, William) Modified on 2/3/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ecorrespondence) (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue. Response now due by 2/10/2020. No further written Order will issue from this Court. (no document attached) Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/27/2020. (sko) Modified on 1/28/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue by DeSoto County, Mississippi, Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Orlansky, William) Modified on 1/27/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Defendant's #6 Motion to Transfer Venue Or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) Modified on 1/21/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Defendant's #6 Motion to Transfer Venue Or, In the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Faith Certificate) (Kidd, D.) Modified on 1/21/2020 (jla). [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Memphis, Tennessee, Jury Demand, filed by Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Orlansky, William) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss for Improper Venue by City of Memphis, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - E-correspondence) (Kidd, D.) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William A. Orlansky on behalf of Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District (Orlansky, William) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Whiteman Turner on behalf of Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District (Turner, Keith) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Whiteman Turner on behalf of Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District City of Memphis, Tennessee served on 12/30/2019. (Turner, Keith) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Memphis, Tennessee; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
December 23, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1753186, filed by Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Supp Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla) [Transferred from Mississippi Northern on 8/24/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District v. City of Memphis, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horn Lake Creek Basin Interceptor Sewer District
Represented By: William A. Brown
Represented By: Mary L. Brown
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Represented By: Keith Whiteman Turner
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Represented By: William Abram Orlansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desoto County, Mississippi
Represented By: Samuel Thomas Barber
Represented By: Anthony E. Nowak
Represented By: William A. Orlansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Memphis Tennessee
Represented By: D. Sterling Kidd
Represented By: Bruce McMullen
Represented By: Pete A. Brunson
Represented By: Mary Wu Tullis
Represented By: Carmalita Philina Carletos-Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?