Nelson et al v. Great American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Will J Nelson, Sr. and Hattie N. Nelson
Defendant: Bettye Sue Bedwell, Cadles of West Virginia and Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02693
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Thomas L Parker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 22 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 10/28/2020. (Parker, Thomas)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 PRO SE NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (btg)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cadles of West Virginia. (Parker, Toni)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Toni C. Parker on behalf of Cadles of West Virginia (Parker, Toni)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #12 Notice of Appearance filed by Cadles of West Virginia has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleading is blank. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
October 19, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company. (McLean, Albert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert G. McLean on behalf of Great American Insurance Company (McLean, Albert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(McLean, Albert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cadles of West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order of District Court Dismissing Appeal, #2 Exhibit B Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit C Order Approving Cadles Settlement, #4 Exhibit D Order Striking Pleading of Motion to Reconsider, #5 Exhibit E Order on Turnover of Funds, #6 Exhibit F Obj to Compromise, #7 Exhibit G Motion to Strike)(Parker, Toni)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cadles of West Virginia. (Parker, Toni)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Toni C. Parker on behalf of Cadles of West Virginia (Parker, Toni)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of of Service by Bettye Sue Bedwell. (Bailey, James)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Bailey, III on behalf of Bettye Sue Bedwell (Bailey, James)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bettye Sue Bedwell. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum (Preliminary Injunction), #3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum (Motion to Alter or Amend), #4 Exhibit 3 to Memorandum (BNC Notice of Service on Settlement Motions), #5 Exhibit 4 to Memorandum (Financial Statement Previously filed in Case 16-cv-02283), #6 Exhibit 5 to Memorandum (Order on Turnover of Funds from Court Registry and BNC Notice of Service of Motion))(Bailey, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Proof of Service on Great American Insurance Company, Cadles and Bedwell filed by Hattie N. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 proof of service - Cadles, #2 proof of service- Bedwell)(jae)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bettye Sue Bedwell, Cadles of West Virginia, Great American Insurance Company. Summons were signed and sealed and returned to plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Agreement to receive notice of electronic filing by Hattie N. Nelson (jae)
September 16, 2020 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case initiation fee: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number M4676046871 (csf)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Will J Nelson, Sr, Hattie N. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Attached Complaint, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Great American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will J Nelson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie N. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Sue Bedwell
Represented By: James E. Bailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadles of West Virginia
Represented By: Toni C. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Albert G. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?