Shaw Services, LLC v. CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Shaw Services, LLC
Defendant: CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC., Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company and Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Case Number: 2:2020cv02696
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. (Willet, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. (Willet, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC.. (Willet, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss (proposed order submitted) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Willet, John)
November 2, 2020 Filing 25 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 01/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
November 2, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Willet, John)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #22 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Defendants' motion is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall have up to and including November 2, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 10/8/2020. (Norris, Mark)
October 8, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (proposed Order Emailed to Judge) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Consultation)(Willet, John)
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Regan S Sherwood on behalf of All Defendants (Sherwood, Regan)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Getz on behalf of All Defendants (Getz, Joseph)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Willet on behalf of All Defendants (Willet, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Regan S Sherwood on behalf of CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Sherwood, Regan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Willet on behalf of CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Willet, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Getz on behalf of CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC. (Getz, Joseph)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Summons by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Shaw Services, LLC. (Schrack, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Notice of Summons filed by Shaw Services, LLC has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Notice of summons is the same as the Notice of Summons on DE #9 . Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (btg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (btg)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Shaw Services, LLC. (Schrack, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Summons by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Shaw Services, LLC. (Schrack, Andrew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Shaw Services, LLC. (Schrack, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jld)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K. Van Namen on behalf of Shaw Services, LLC (Van Namen, Kathryn)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Schrack on behalf of Shaw Services, LLC (Schrack, Andrew)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3438474), filed by Shaw Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A (subcontract between Shaw and Magnolia), #2 Exhibit EX B (Bond), #3 Exhibit EX C (Shaw letter of 7/23/20), #4 Exhibit EX D (cover letter to the Proof of Claim ), #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Less, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw Services, LLC v. CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDM CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Represented By: John D. Willet
Represented By: Joseph T Getz
Represented By: Regan S Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Willet
Represented By: Joseph T Getz
Represented By: Regan S Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland
Represented By: John D. Willet
Represented By: Joseph T Getz
Represented By: Regan S Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaw Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael I. Less
Represented By: Andrew B Schrack
Represented By: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?