Phillips 66 Company v. ATL Enterprise Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phillips 66 Company
Defendant: ATL Enterprise Inc. and Sheikh Ahamed
Case Number: 2:2020cv02706
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME #19 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 11/5/20. (shl)
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by ATL Enterprise Inc., Sheikh Ahamed. (Nahmias, Adam)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Nahmias, Adam)
November 3, 2020 Filing 18 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, December 8, 2020 at 2:00 via Skype Video before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
November 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Nahmias on behalf of All Defendants (Nahmias, Adam)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 10/16/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/28/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 9/28/20. (Lipman, Sheryl)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tyson D. Smith (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3447007) by Phillips 66 Company. (Smith, Tyson)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen P. Meleen (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3447000) by Phillips 66 Company. (Meleen, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillips 66 Company as to Sheikh Ahamed. (Wellford, Buckner)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillips 66 Company as to ATL Enterprise Inc.. (Wellford, Buckner)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sheikh Ahamed. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ATL Enterprise Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jld)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 3,129,949; 4,231,335; 570,821; 711,098; 935,806; 1,067,959; 1,911,017 566,785; 2,940,047; 2,935,849; 2,961,378; 3,354,648; 3,226,183; 3,226,182. (Wellford, Buckner)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 Company. (Wellford, Buckner)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3441129), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to ATL Enterprise Inc., #3 Summons Summons to Sheikh Ahamed, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(Wellford, Buckner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips 66 Company v. ATL Enterprise Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATL Enterprise Inc.
Represented By: Adam M. Nahmias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheikh Ahamed
Represented By: Adam M. Nahmias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillips 66 Company
Represented By: Buckner Wellford
Represented By: Tyson David Smith
Represented By: Stephen P Meleen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?