Weeks et al v. Sands et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Weeks, Barbara K Weeks, Matthew A Alt and Alice K Alt
Defendant: Davarious Sands, Western Flyer Express, LLC, USAA Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Not Classified By Court: Ed Pulliam
Case Number: 2:2020cv02709
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Western Flyer Express, LLC of Service of Discovery (Myatt, Christopher)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alice K Alt, Barbara K Weeks, Matthew A Alt, Patrick Weeks as to Davarious Sands. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Lancaster, Edward)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Western Flyer Express, LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Myatt, Christopher)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by USAA Casualty Insurance Company of Service of USAA Casualty Insurance Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Gresham, Darryl)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE by Alice K Alt, Matthew A Alt, Barbara K Weeks, Patrick Weeks of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Lancaster, Edward)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Reissued as to Davarious Sands. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Summons by Gary K. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Gary)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: Parties notified the court of decision to proceed before Magistrate Judge Tu Pham. Therefore, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED. (jrs)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence W. White on behalf of Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co (White, Lawrence)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/20/2020. (pa)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Joint). (Myatt, Christopher)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl D. Gresham on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Gresham, Darryl)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit of E. Patrick Lancaster, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Affidavit of Caitlin Tran, #3 Certificate of Consultation Certificate of Consultation, #4 Memorandum Memorandum of Facts and Law in Support of Motion)(Lancaster, Edward)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward P. Lancaster on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lancaster, Edward)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Western Flyer Express, LLC.(Myatt, Christopher)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, 10/22/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee L. Piovarcy on behalf of Western Flyer Express, LLC (Piovarcy, Lee)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western Flyer Express, LLC from Fayette County Circuit Court, case number 20CV39 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3442251), filed by Western Flyer Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Discovery)(Myatt, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weeks et al v. Sands et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davarious Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Flyer Express, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Darryl D. Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Lawrence W. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Weeks
Represented By: Gary K. Smith
Represented By: E Patrick Lancaster
Represented By: Edward P. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara K Weeks
Represented By: Gary K. Smith
Represented By: E Patrick Lancaster
Represented By: Edward P. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A Alt
Represented By: Gary K. Smith
Represented By: E Patrick Lancaster
Represented By: Edward P. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice K Alt
Represented By: Gary K. Smith
Represented By: E Patrick Lancaster
Represented By: Edward P. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Ed Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?