American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. et al v. Varsity Brands, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC doing business as Jeff and Craig Camps, Ashley Haygood, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. and Rockstar Championships, LLC
Defendant: USA Federation for Sport Cheering doing business as USA Cheer, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, BSN Sports, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., Bain Capital, LP, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC, Jeff Webb and Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02782
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
October 28, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
October 27, 2020 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-03088. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2020: #2 Judicial Cards) (csf).
October 27, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of USDC WD TN, Western Division. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - The Court GRANTS Moving Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Action to the Western District of Tennessee (Doc. No. #34 ). Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with LR 16.1 NDGa. (Doc. No. #46 ) is DENIED as MOOT. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to effectuate the transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Western Division, and to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/27/2020. (tcc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC, Jeff Webb re Submission to District Judge Defendants' Objection to Submission (Carrier, Sarah) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Submission of #46 MOTION to Compel Compliance with local Rule 16.1 to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Submission of #34 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Grady Garrison re #54 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Nicole Berkowitz re #53 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #50 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Grady Garrison. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/1/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nicole Berkowitz. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/1/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #35 Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/01/2020. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 30, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #50 APPLICATION for Admission of Grady Garrison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10188764).. Attorney Grady Garrison added appearing on behalf of U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 30, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #49 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicole Berkowitz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10187121).. Attorney Nicole Berkowitz added appearing on behalf of U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering (nmb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee filed by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Carrier, Sarah) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 50 APPLICATION for Admission of Grady Garrison Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10188764). with Brief In Support by U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.. (Cooper, Jennifer) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 49 APPLICATION for Admission of Nicole Berkowitz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-10187121). with Brief In Support by U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.. (Cooper, Jennifer) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Brendan Patrick Gaffney re #48 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Paul Edward Coggins re #47 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #39 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brendan Patrick Gaffney. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/24/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #38 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul Edward Coggins. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/24/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION to Compel Compliance with local Rule 16.1 with Brief In Support by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Pl. Memorandum of law in support of Mtn. to Compel Compliance with local Rule 16.1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A.Mem. of law on Mtn to Compel Comp. local rule 16.1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B. Mem. of law on Mtn. to Compel, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order. Pl. Mtn to Compel local Rule 16.1)(Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Submission of #35 MOTION to Stay to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Carrier, Sarah) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ashley Haygood)(Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Pl. Rule 5.4 for RTP to Certain Def. by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc..(Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 17, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #38 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul E. Coggins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138770).. Attorney Paul Edward Coggins added appearing on behalf of Jeff Webb (cdg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 17, 2020 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #39 APPLICATION for Admission of Brendan P. Gaffney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138887).. Attorney Brendan Patrick Gaffney added appearing on behalf of Jeff Webb (cdg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 41 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Persons by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Carrier, Sarah) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 APPLICATION for Admission of Brendan P. Gaffney Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138887).by Jeff Webb. (Trevino, Talis) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 APPLICATION for Admission of Paul E. Coggins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-10138770).by Jeff Webb. (Trevino, Talis) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Talis Colgan Trevino on behalf of Jeff Webb (Trevino, Talis) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer with Brief In Support by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Steven Kaiser)(Carrier, Sarah) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee with Brief In Support by BSN Sports, LLC, Bain Capital, LP, Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC, Herff Jones, LLC, Stanbury, LLC, U.S. All Star Federation, Inc., USA Federation for Sport Cheering, Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc., Varsity Brands, LLC, Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC, Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC, Varsity Spirit, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Steven Kaiser, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Steve Peterson, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of John Newby, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Bill Seely)(Carrier, Sarah) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. U.S. All Star Federation, Inc. waiver mailed on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Spirit, LLC. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Brands, LLC. (rjs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. Varsity Spirit Fashions and Supplies_Summons (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. Varsity Spirit_Summons (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. Varsity Brands_Summons (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons by American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.. (Falanga, Robert) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 36 Electronic Summons Issued as to BSN Sports, LLC. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jeff Webb. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc.. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to USA Federation for Sport Cheering. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Stanbury, LLC. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Herff Jones, LLC. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Bain Capital, LP. (adg) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Haygood, Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC, American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc., Rockstar Championships, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9949913) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc. et al v. Varsity Brands, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Federation for Sport Cheering doing business as USA Cheer
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Represented By: Grady Garrison
Represented By: Nicole Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herff Jones, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSN Sports, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. All Star Federation, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Grandoff Cooper
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Represented By: Grady Garrison
Represented By: Nicole Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bain Capital, LP
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Spirit Fashion & Supplies, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Intropia Tours, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanbury, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Brands, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Spirit, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Webb
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Gaffney
Represented By: Paul Edward Coggins
Represented By: Talis Colgan Trevino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varsity Brands Holding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Margaret Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff & Craig Cheer, LLC doing business as Jeff and Craig Camps
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Haygood
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Spirit and Cheer Essentials, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockstar Championships, LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Falanga
Represented By: Handerson Kobelah Wellington Svensen Bennah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?