FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES v. United States of America
Plaintiff: FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv02794
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 United States' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 12/14/2020. The time within which the government shall file its response to Plaintiffs complaint shall be and hereby is extended through and including February 19, 2021. (Mays, Samuel)
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Proposed order submitted. by United States of America. (Johnson, Cory)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 12/9/2020. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3500949) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Johnson, Cory)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter David Blumberg on behalf of FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES (Blumberg, Peter)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and related Exhibits and Appendix served on The Honorable William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States of America on November 16, 2020, filed by FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES. (Judkins, Joseph)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and related Exhibits and Appendix served on The Honorable William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States of America on November 16, 2020, filed by FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES. (Judkins, Joseph)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and related Exhibits and Appendix served on D. Michael Dunavant, United States Attorney's Office on November 3, 2020, filed by FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES. (Judkins, Joseph)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Roberts on behalf of FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES (Roberts, Richard)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Notice of Appearance filed by FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The date of signature and the case number are missing from the notice of appearance. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R. Roberts on behalf of FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES (Roberts, Richard)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney D. Michael Dunavant. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Attorney General William Barr. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George Millington Clarke, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Clarke, George)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Reilly on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reilly, Cameron)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3474562), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Appendix, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Judkins, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEX CORPORATION and SUBSIDIARIES
Represented By: Joseph Judkins
Represented By: George Millington Clarke, III
Represented By: Cameron Reilly
Represented By: Richard R. Roberts
Represented By: Peter David Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cory A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?