King v. MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC
Plaintiff: Lynn King and Steven King
Defendant: MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02881
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC (Carr, Katherine)
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Lynn King, Steven King of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Sheng, Elaine)
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC (Carr, Katherine)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 1/12/21. (Lipman, Sheryl)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial is set for Tuesday, February 15, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 28, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, February 4, 2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
January 12, 2021 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: A Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 1/12/2021. Elaine Sheng appeared for the plaintiff(s). Katherine E. Carr appeared for defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. Jury Trial is set for Tuesday, February 15, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial expected to last approximately 2-3 days. Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, January 28, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, February 4, 2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be Entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (Court Reporter Candace Covey.) (smm)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Carr, Katherine)
December 11, 2020 Two dollar fee difference $ 2 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3502948. (Carr, Katherine)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven King as to MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC. (Sheng, Elaine)
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, January 12, 2021 at 1:30 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conferencing before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC.(Carr, Katherine)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, and Exhibit A (Carr, Katherine)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC. (Carr, Katherine)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC from CIRCUIT COURT OF TENNESSEE FOR THE THIRTIETH JUDICIAL DISTRICT AT MEMPHIS, case number CT-4721-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3499190), filed by MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Carr, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn King
Represented By: Elaine Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven King
Represented By: Elaine Sheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACS CONVENIENCE STORES, LLC
Represented By: Katherine E. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?