Stafford et al v. Penske Truck Leasing Co. a/k/a Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP et al
Plaintiff: Kierah Slone, Jared Lee Helton, Lonja Helton, Richard Helton, Jennifer Stafford, Emily Sage Stafford and Justin Stafford
Defendant: Jewell Trucking LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co. a/k/a Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP, Mervin Lee Crigler, Penske Truck Leasing Company, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation and Penske Truck Leasing Co. LP
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02891
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie M. Stewart on behalf of Mervin Lee Crigler (Stewart, Melanie)
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Lee Helton as to Jewell Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 green card, #2 USPS Tracking Report)(Turner, Jessica)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Jewell Trucking LLC by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Insurance)(Lebair, Harry)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Jewell Trucking LLC by Penske Truck Leasing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rental Agreement, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Insurance)(Lebair, Harry)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jared Lee Helton as to Mervin Lee Crigler. (Ardis, Patrick)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 03/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jewell Trucking LLC.(Feeney, John)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Jewell Trucking LLC and Mervin Lee Crigler. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(btg)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons by Patrick M. Ardis on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jewel Trucking, #2 Summons Mervin Crigler)(Ardis, Patrick)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice (Other), filed by Penske Truck Leasing Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filing fee was not submitted upon opening of this case. Please go to: Civil- Other Documents- Pay Civil Filing Fee. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae)
December 11, 2020 Civil Filing fee $ 402 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3502906. (Lebair, Harry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Penske Truck Leasing Co. a/k/a Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP Notice of Filing of "Defendants' Notice of Removal" (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Notice of Removal)(Lebair, Harry)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Penske Truck Leasing Co. a/k/a Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP Defendant's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C Pl residence, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D Notice of Filing)(Lebair, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stafford et al v. Penske Truck Leasing Co. a/k/a Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kierah Slone
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Lee Helton
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonja Helton
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Helton
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stafford
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Sage Stafford
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Stafford
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell Trucking LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co. a/k/a Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mervin Lee Crigler
Represented By: Melanie M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Company
Represented By: Harry W. Lebair, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Harry W. Lebair, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co. LP
Represented By: Harry W. Lebair, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?