Hall et al v. Stine Seed Company
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL TRUSTEE GROUP, LLC and David Allen Hall
Defendant: Stine Seed Company
Not Classified By Court: Temiika Gipson
Case Number: 2:2020cv02906
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
2 Judge: Mark S Norris
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted by Stine Seed Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Calaf, Maria)
February 8, 2021 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Stine Seed Company, filed by David Allen Hall, INTERNATIONAL TRUSTEE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Soil Analysis Reports from Waypoint)(Gastel, Benjamin)
January 18, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Stine Seed Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Calaf, Maria)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/23/2020. (Mark S. Norris)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/23/2020. (Mark S. Norris)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/23/2020. (Mark S. Norris)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Stine Seed Company. (Simms, Jack)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Stine Seed Company. (Chiarello, Katherine)
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 Corrected MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Stine Seed Company. (Calaf, Maria)
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3509317) filed by Stine Seed Company, #15 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by Stine Seed Company, #16 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by Stine Seed Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Two (2) Certificates of Good Standing must be included with the motions;. One must be from the highest State Court, and one from a Federal District Court. All certificates must be dated within 30 days of the filing of the motion. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (btg)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Stine Seed Company. (Simms, Jack)
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Stine Seed Company. (Chiarello, Katherine)
December 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3509317) by Stine Seed Company. (Calaf, Maria)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 12/18/2020. (Mark S. Norris)
December 18, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ANNIE T. CHRISTOFF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 12/18/2020. (mpk)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer proposed order submitted by Stine Seed Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Koury, Joseph)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted to chambers (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3507743) by Stine Seed Company. (Simms, Jack)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted to chambers (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3507722) by Stine Seed Company. (Chiarello, Katherine)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Stine Seed Company Cover Sheet (Koury, Joseph)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Stine Seed Company has been filed. The civil cover sheet is blank. Please fill in and refile. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. (jld)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jld)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Shelby Circuit, case number CT-4832-20 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNWDC-3507169), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph M. Koury, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Koury, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Stine Seed Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stine Seed Company
Represented By: Jack A Simms, Jr
Represented By: Katherine Chiarello
Represented By: Joseph Koury
Represented By: Maria Amelia Calaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL TRUSTEE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Van Davis Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Hall
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Van Davis Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Gastel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Temiika Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?