H. Saga International Inc. v. Martinez et al
Plaintiff: H. Saga International Inc.
Defendant: Republic Medical Finance, LLC, Republic, Medical Financial Solutions, LLC and Rafael Martinez
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2021cv02084
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Smith, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/16/21. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, April 18, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 1, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 8, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: A Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conferencing on 03/16/2021. Pablo Adrian Varela appeared for the plaintiff(s). Jeffrey C. Smith appeared for the defendant(s). Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #9 was denied as moot without prejudice to refile. The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Non-Jury Trial set for Monday, April 18, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, April 1, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, April 8, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by H. Saga International Inc.. (Varela, Pablo)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rafael Martinez, Medical Financial Solutions, LLC, Republic, Republic Medical Finance, LLC, filed by H. Saga International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Varela, Pablo)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Ronald Swatley on behalf of H. Saga International Inc. (Swatley, Jacob)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Varela, Pablo)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The Scheduling Conference is reset for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 at 2:30 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(smm)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #8 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 2/19/21. (shl)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Exhibit Ex D, #6 Exhibit Ex E, #7 Exhibit Ex F, #8 Exhibit Ex G)(Smith, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION Reset Initial Scheduling Conference proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Smith, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Thursday, March 11, 2021 at 1:45 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(smm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Quynh-Anh Dang Kibler on behalf of Rafael Martinez, Republic Medical Finance, LLC (Kibler, Quynh-Anh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Republic Medical Finance, LLC, Rafael Martinez from Shelby Chancery, case number CH-20-1581-2 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNWDC-3540868), filed by Republic Medical Finance, LLC, Rafael Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Smith, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. Saga International Inc. v. Martinez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Medical Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Smith
Represented By: Quynh-Anh D. Kibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Smith
Represented By: Quynh-Anh D. Kibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Saga International Inc.
Represented By: John L. Ryder
Represented By: Pablo Adrian Varela
Represented By: Jacob Ronald Swatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?