Jones v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Vernon Jones
Defendant: Park Place Property Management, LLC d/b/a Home River Group, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10, Wilson & Associates, PLLC, BTH Residential, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Harkavy Shainberg & Kaplan PLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Case Number: 2:2021cv02088
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: Sheryl H Lipman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Selection of Mediator by Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10. (Perry, Benjamin)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/29/21. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 16, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by BTH Residential, LLC.(Whitlock, Derek)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/16/21. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL WITH PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: Jury Trial set for Monday, February 28, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 1-2 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 11, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, February 18, 2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman: A Scheduling Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conferencing on 03/16/2021. Bo Luxman appeared for the plaintiff(s). Benjamin William Perry and Derek E. Whitlock appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the dates and deadlines with the parties. Jury Trial set for Monday, February 28, 2022 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Trial is estimated to last 1-2 days. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by Friday, February 11, 2022. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, February 18, 2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. Scheduling Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey)(smm)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 JUDGMENT. Party Harkavy Shainberg & Kaplan PLC and Park Place Property Management, LLC d/b/a Home River Group terminated. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 3/11/21. (Lipman, Sheryl)
March 11, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal by BTH Residential, LLC. (Whitlock, Derek)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek E. Whitlock on behalf of BTH Residential, LLC (Whitlock, Derek)
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Perry, Benjamin)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10.(Perry, Benjamin)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: A Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 at 1:00 PM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions.(smm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange for Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc... (Perry, Benjamin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10 identifying Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10.. (Perry, Benjamin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Perry, Benjamin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHH Mortgage Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation.. (Perry, Benjamin)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10, Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc. from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-20-1572 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3542386), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10, Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Chancery Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Trustee's Deed)(Perry, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Place Property Management, LLC d/b/a Home River Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2004-RS10
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTH Residential, LLC
Represented By: Derek E. Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harkavy Shainberg & Kaplan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin William Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon Jones
Represented By: Bo Luxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Clerk W. Aaron Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?