Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Lamination Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco Technology, Inc.
Defendant: HES Limited, Ezzell Enterprises, Inc., Lamination Service, Inc., Does 1-50 and LSI Graphics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02139
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Defendants Lamination Service, Inc., LSI Graphics, LLC, and Ezzell Enterprises, Inc. (LSI Defendants) move unopposed for an extension of time through May 19, 2021, to respond to the Complaint. (ECF No. 34.) For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the LSI Defendants motion. The LSI Defendants shall have through May 19, 2021, to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/4/2021. (kll)
May 4, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Proposed Order Submitted by Ezzell Enterprises, Inc., LSI Graphics, LLC, Lamination Service, Inc.. (Hughes, Brett)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY- - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**]: Defendants Lamination Service, Inc., LSI Graphics, LLC, and Ezzell Enterprise, Inc. (LSI Defendants) move unopposed for an extension of time through May 5, 2021, to respond to the complaint. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion. LSI Defendants shall have through May 5, 2021, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/2/2021. (kll)
April 1, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Hamm Huseth on behalf of Ezzell Enterprises, Inc., LSI Graphics, LLC, Lamination Service, Inc. (Huseth, Emily)
April 1, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by Ezzell Enterprises, Inc., LSI Graphics, LLC, Lamination Service, Inc.. (Hughes, Brett)
April 1, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett A. Hughes on behalf of Ezzell Enterprises, Inc., LSI Graphics, LLC, Lamination Service, Inc. (Hughes, Brett)
March 30, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION : PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY EMAIL ON DEFENDANT HES LIMITED AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SAME (proposed order submitted) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Neil Sheridan)(Nelson, Richard)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #21 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/22/2021. (kll)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #22 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/22/2021. (kll)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #23 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/22/2021. (kll)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #24 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/22/2021. (kll)
March 22, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (fee receipt number ATNWDC-3568312) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Minasyan, Artur)
March 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (fee receipt number ATNWDC-3570067) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (He, Angela)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (fee receipt number ATNWDC-3569652) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Shore, James)
March 22, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (fee receipt number ATNWDC-3569590) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Nelson, Richard)
March 21, 2021 Filing 20 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (fee receipt number ATNWDC-3568312) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3569590) filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3570067) filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3569652) filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the pleadings have "wet" signatures and not the required electronic signatures. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3570067) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (He, Angela)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (fee receipt number ATNWDC-3568312) (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Minasyan, Artur)
March 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3569652) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Shore, James)
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3569590) by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Nelson, Richard)
March 18, 2021 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3568312) filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the proper filing procedures were not used to file the motion. Attorneys seeking admission pro hac vice should file the motion on an individually basis. Please review the Court's CM/ECF Policy and Procedures 3.1 for the correct filing procedures. The order granting the motion, DE #14 , is held in abeyance until the proper procedures have been followed. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #13 . Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/17/2021. (kll)
March 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3568312) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 9certificates of good standing), #2 Exhibit proposed order)(Faughnan, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. as to LSI Graphics, LLC. (Faughnan, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. as to Lamination Service, Inc.. (Faughnan, Brian)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. as to Ezzell Enterprises, Inc.. (Faughnan, Brian)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ezzell Enterprises, Inc., HES Limited, Lamination Service, Inc. and LSI Graphics. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 HES Limited, #2 Lamination Services, #3 LSI Graphics)(agj)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons by Brian S. Faughnan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Ezzell Enterprises, #2 Summons to HES Limited, #3 Summons to Lamination Services, #4 Summons to LSI Graphics)(Faughnan, Brian)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint, 6 Deficiency Notice,, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faughnan, Brian)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the Civil Cover Sheet was not submitted with the complaint. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3562309), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Faughnan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Lamination Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Faughnan
Represented By: Richard J. Nelson
Represented By: Angela M He
Represented By: James Alan Shore
Represented By: Artur Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S. Faughnan
Represented By: Richard J. Nelson
Represented By: Angela M He
Represented By: James Alan Shore
Represented By: Artur Minasyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HES Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezzell Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Brett A. Hughes
Represented By: Emily Hamm Huseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamination Service, Inc.
Represented By: Brett A. Hughes
Represented By: Emily Hamm Huseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Graphics, LLC
Represented By: Brett A. Hughes
Represented By: Emily Hamm Huseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?